open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-bk-11384-BR
    Party Name:Jason W Cooley and Renee D Jiji
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchaca, (TR) John J [ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Chapter 7 (CACB AutoDischarge) (BNC)]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchaca, (TR) John J [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchaca, (TR) John J [Certification About a Financial Management Course for Debtor 2 (Joint Debtor) (Official Form 423)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchaca, (TR) John J [Certification About a Financial Management Course for Debtor 1 (Official Form 423)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchaca, (TR) John J [Voluntary Dismissal of Motion]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchaca, (TR) John J [Hearing Set(Motion)]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchaca, (TR) John J [Relief - Personal Property (motion)]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchaca, (TR) John J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchaca, (TR) John J [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset) (I/J No POC)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchaca, (TR) John J [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Per Part 5 of Voluntary Petition)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchaca, (TR) John J [Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchaca, (TR) John J [Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Db Received Income From an Employer (LBR Form F1002-1)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menchaca, (TR) John J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1853258
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =