Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of California
    Case Number:19-20766
    Party Name:Alexis Torres Garcia
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McGranahan, Michael D. [Financial Management Course Certificate - Debtor and/or Joint Debtor]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McGranahan, Michael D. [Notice of No Distribution (Certificate)]
    Date Published:March 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McGranahan, Michael D. [Notice of No Distribution]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McGranahan, Michael D. [Report of No Distribution/341 Mtg Concluded () - Including Amended]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McGranahan, Michael D. [CR/ECF - Installment Fee Paid]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McGranahan, Michael D. [Installment Fee Paid]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McGranahan, Michael D. [Notice of Meeting of Creditors (Certificate)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McGranahan, Michael D. [Requirement to File a Statement of Completion - Financial Management (Certificate)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McGranahan, Michael D. [341 Meeting - Chapter 7 Only]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McGranahan, Michael D. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McGranahan, Michael D. [Request for Special Notice]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McGranahan, Michael D. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (Links to Application to Pay Installments) - eFiled]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McGranahan, Michael D. [Master Address List]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McGranahan, Michael D. [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McGranahan, Michael D. [First Meeting - 7]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McGranahan, Michael D. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McGranahan, Michael D. [Appointment of Interim Trustee - Including Amended Appointment (Produces Form)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McGranahan, Michael D. [Voluntary Petition 7 - Case Upload]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.caeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?624492
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =