Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of California
    Case Number:4:19-cv-00735
    Party Name:Hasha v. Grand Prix San Mateo LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Case Assigned by Intake]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Summons]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?338190
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =