Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of California
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00734
    Party Name:Gonzalez v. Yoo et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate/Proof of Service]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Opposition/Response]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Opposition/Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Notice]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Case Assigned by Intake]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Summons]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?338189
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =