open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of California
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00733
    Party Name:Johnson v. Silver Creek Car Wash
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Case Assigned by Intake]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Summons]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?338188
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =