Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00069-1
    Party Name:USA v. Boorsma
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Trial, Change of Plea or Sentencing]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Order]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unredacted Document]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment - Post Indictment]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Advisement of Defendant's Statutory & Constitutional Rights (CR-10)]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest on Indictment - Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report Commencing Criminal Action (CR-64)]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum by US Attorney re Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum by US Attorney re Investigative Action]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Summary (CR-72)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?736600
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =