Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of California
    Case Number:4:02-cr-00388-1
    Party Name:USA v. Oregana
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [ID of Counsel Hearing]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Substitution of Attorney]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?48845
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =