Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of California
    Case Number:19-02039
    Party Name:Carter, Jr. et al v. Real Time Resolutions, Inc.
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Matter Continued *]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Initial Disclosures]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Status Conference Statement]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate PARTY - Including Supplemental]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Exhibit(s)]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BDRP]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order to Confer]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Adversary Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint (Intake)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.caeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?625956
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =