Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of California
    Case Number:19-21584
    Party Name:Alfredo L Jaucian, Jr and Anna Lissa S Jaucian
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whatley, Douglas M. [Financial Management Course Certificate - Debtor and/or Joint Debtor]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whatley, Douglas M. [341 Mtg Continued/341 Mtg Concluded - Including Amended]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whatley, Douglas M. [Personal Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whatley, Douglas M. [Summary/Schedules/Stmt Fin Affairs/Disclosure-Including Amendments]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whatley, Douglas M. [122A-1, 122A-2, 122A-1Supp: Ch. 7 - Statement of Current Monthly Income - Including Amendments]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whatley, Douglas M. [BNC Service of Document (Certificate)]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whatley, Douglas M. [BNC Service of Document]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whatley, Douglas M. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules (Order)]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whatley, Douglas M. [Order for Judge's Signature - Motion Extend Schedules/Documents/Plan Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whatley, Douglas M. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules - Including Amended Motion]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whatley, Douglas M. [BNC Service of Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case (Certificate)]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whatley, Douglas M. [Notice of Meeting of Creditors (Certificate)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whatley, Douglas M. [Requirement to File a Statement of Completion - Financial Management (Certificate)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whatley, Douglas M. [Request for Special Notice]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whatley, Douglas M. [BNC Service of Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whatley, Douglas M. [341 Meeting - Chapter 7 Only]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whatley, Douglas M. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whatley, Douglas M. [CR/ECF - Voluntary Petition Fee Paid]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whatley, Douglas M. [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whatley, Douglas M. [First Meeting - 7]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whatley, Douglas M. [Appointment of Interim Trustee - Including Amended Appointment (Produces Form)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whatley, Douglas M. [Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whatley, Douglas M. [Master Address List]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whatley, Douglas M. [Voluntary Petition - 7]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.caeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?625955
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =