Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00495
    Party Name:Aguirre v. United States Nuclear Regulatory Commission et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Transfer Pursuant to Low Number Rule]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Related Case]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.casd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?620178
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =