open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-02472
    Party Name:Daniel Canizales v. City of South Gate et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference - optional html form]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 19-03 (CV-52)]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?741795
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =