open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-03938
    Party Name:Clear Recon Corp v. All Claimants to Surplus Funds After a Trustee's Sale of Real Property Located at 1301 S. Malgren Ave., San Pedro, CA 90732 et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Chief District Judge Transferring Case]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?745704
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =