open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00394-1
    Party Name:USA v. Puhena, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing (plea accepted)]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment - Post Indictment]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Advisement of Defendant's Statutory & Constitutional Rights (CR-10)]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest on Indictment - Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Returning Case for Reassignment (CR-84)]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Pursuant to GO 19-03-DECLINED-(Related Case)(CR-59)]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum by US Attorney]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Summary (CR-72)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?752300
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =