open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:3:19-po-02124-1
    Party Name:USA vs Radack
  • Filing Type:[Disposition of Count]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:[CVB Updates - NEF Work-Around]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Add Disposition Text]
    Date Published:October 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:October 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Payment Received]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Supplemental CVB Document]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order to Continue]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Citation Issued]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Set Hearings]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.casd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?641676
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =