open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-07795
    Party Name:Andrew Mattle v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Chief District Judge Transferring Case]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transferring Case purs GO 19-03 (Related Case)(CV-34)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney (G-01)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?758199
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =