open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:19-cv-09941
    Party Name:Reynaldo G. Gutierrez v. City of Long Beach
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:July 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Related Document]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:December 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand Case to State Court]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?765132
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =