Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Compensation (Trustee)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Certificate of Non-Contested Matter]
    Date Published:October 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [9013-1.1 Notice]
    Date Published:September 21, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Chapter 7 Trustee's Application for Compensation]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Report]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Receipt of Filing Fee]
    Date Published:June 27, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Virtual Order: Compliance With Rules Re: COS on Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:June 27, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Schedule D And/Or Schedule E/F]
    Date Published:June 27, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Zero Clerk's Fees Due]
    Date Published:June 20, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:April 29, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Discharge-Auto Docket]
    Date Published:April 27, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Receipt of Final Installment Payment]
    Date Published:April 26, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Possible Dividend]
    Date Published:March 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Notice of Possible Dividends]
    Date Published:March 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Meeting of Creditors Satisfied]
    Date Published:February 27, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Virtual Order: Stipulation (Chapter 7 Trustee's Stipulation for Turnover)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Stipulation (For Turnover)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:February 06, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Change of Address]
    Date Published:February 03, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Personal Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Set Notice of Financial Course Due Date]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Set UST Statement of Abuse and Financial Course Due Date]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [BPP's Notice, Declaration, and Signature (Form 119)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Disclosure of Compensation By Petition Preparer]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income Form (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Social Security Number]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Receipt of First Installment Payment]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [Auto Assignment of Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10185-
    Party Name:Darrel Raymond Dolan
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walters, Jared [New Bankruptcy Case Opened]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cob.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?455509

Post Your Comment or Question

6 x 1 =