Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Chapter 13 Fees and Expenses and Notice]
    Date Published:November 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Certificate of Non-Contested Matter]
    Date Published:November 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Leave to File]
    Date Published:November 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Chapter 13 Fees and Expenses (Application) and Notice]
    Date Published:October 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Pay Wages (Motion filed by trustee)]
    Date Published:September 20, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Pay Wages To Trustee]
    Date Published:September 20, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Virtual Order: Confirming Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 01, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Verification of Confirmable Plan]
    Date Published:September 01, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Change of Address]
    Date Published:August 30, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Attorney Change of Address (Batch - RDT)]
    Date Published:August 04, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses and Charges]
    Date Published:June 30, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Notice of Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:June 29, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Minutes of Proceedings/Minute Order]
    Date Published:June 22, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Chapter 13 Notice of Financial Management and/or Domestic Support Obligation Certificate]
    Date Published:April 06, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [3015 Notice]
    Date Published:March 22, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 22, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Certificate and Motion to Determine Notice]
    Date Published:March 07, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Claimant's Notice Request]
    Date Published:February 20, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Objection to Confirmation/Modification of Plan]
    Date Published:February 03, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Reassignment]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Set Notice of Financial Course Due Date]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Corrected Public Entry-Q.A.]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Notice of Deficiency]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Notice of Reassignment (Prior Filing or Related Filings)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Entry Re: Debtor's Repeat Filing]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184-
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Employee Income Record and/or Statement Concerning No Employee Income Record]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Record and/or Statement Concerning No Employee Income Record]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income & Commitment Period Form (122C-1)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan (Condensed) - BNC]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Social Security Number]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10184
    Party Name:Justin P Gumo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cob.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?455508

Post Your Comment or Question

2 x 1 =