Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Compensation (Trustee)]
    Date Published:December 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Certificate of Non-Contested Matter]
    Date Published:December 07, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [9013-1.1 Notice]
    Date Published:November 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Chapter 7 Trustee's Application for Compensation]
    Date Published:November 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Report]
    Date Published:November 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Change of Address]
    Date Published:November 03, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Attorney Change of Address (Batch - RDT)]
    Date Published:September 20, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Zero Clerk's Fees Due]
    Date Published:May 30, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:April 26, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Discharge-Auto Docket]
    Date Published:April 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Meeting of Creditors Satisfied]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Possible Dividend]
    Date Published:February 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Virtual Order: Stipulation (Chapter 7 Trustee's Stipulation for Turnover)]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Stipulation (For Turnover)]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Notice of Possible Dividends]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:January 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Set Notice of Financial Course Due Date]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Set UST Statement of Abuse and Financial Course Due Date]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Auto Assignment of Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Employee Income Record and/or Statement Concerning No Employee Income Record]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Social Security Number]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income Form (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10183-
    Party Name:Christopher Marshall Mares
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cob.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?455507

Post Your Comment or Question

7 x 3 =