Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Zero Clerk's Fees Due]
    Date Published:May 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:April 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Discharge-Auto Docket]
    Date Published:April 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Receipt of Final Installment Payment]
    Date Published:April 07, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Virtual Order: Turnover]
    Date Published:March 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Meeting of Creditors Satisfied]
    Date Published:February 27, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Turnover (Motion For) and Notice (Chapter 7 Trustees Only)]
    Date Published:February 22, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Possible Dividend]
    Date Published:February 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Virtual Order: Stipulation (Chapter 7 Trustee's Stipulation for Turnover)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Stipulation (For Turnover)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Notice of Possible Dividends]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Personal Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:February 06, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Employee Income Record and/or Statement Concerning No Employee Income Record]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income Form (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Schedule J-2]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Schedule J]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Schedule I]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Schedule H]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Schedule G]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Schedule D And/Or Schedule E/F]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Schedule C]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Schedule A/B]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Declaration Re: Individual Debtor's Schedules]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Receipt of First Installment Payment]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Set Notice of Financial Course Due Date]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Set UST Statement of Abuse and Financial Course Due Date]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Incomplete Case Text Entry]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [BPP's Notice, Declaration, and Signature (Form 119)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Disclosure of Compensation By Petition Preparer]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Social Security Number]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [Auto Assignment of Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:17-10182-
    Party Name:Jose Luis Tonche Caldera
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hill, Jeffrey L. [New Bankruptcy Case Opened]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cob.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?455506

Post Your Comment or Question

1 x 3 =