Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:18-13323-
    Party Name:Chad Eric Sarmiento
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Trustee Fee Paid]
    Date Published:October 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Close Bankruptcy Case-Auto Docket]
    Date Published:September 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:August 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Discharge-Auto Docket]
    Date Published:July 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Payment of Installment Payment (Chapter 7 - Final)]
    Date Published:June 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:June 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Meeting of Creditors Satisfied]
    Date Published:June 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Notice of Impending Dismissal]
    Date Published:June 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Personal Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:May 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:April 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Payment of Installment Payment (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:April 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:April 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:April 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (Individual Debtors Only)]
    Date Published:April 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Set Notice of Financial Course Due Date]
    Date Published:April 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Auto Assignment of Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Employee Pay Advice/Income Record and/or Statement Concerning No Employee Income Record]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Individual Debtors Only)]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Employee Pay Advice/Income Record and/or Statement Concerning No Employee Income Record]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Individual Debtors Only)]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Social Security Number]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income Form (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Social Security Number]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income Form (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cob.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?471147
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =