Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:19-10193-
    Party Name:Limon Electric Supply Inc.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smiley, John [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smiley, John [1009-1.1 Notice of Amendment to Schedule]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smiley, John [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smiley, John [Amended Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smiley, John [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smiley, John [Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smiley, John [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smiley, John [Auto Assignment of Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smiley, John [Corporate Ownership Statement (Rule 7007.1)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Corporate Ownership Statement (Rule 7007.1)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smiley, John [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smiley, John [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cob.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?479526
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =