Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:19-10192-
    Party Name:April Kimberley Wagner
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Meeting of Creditors Satisfied]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Claimant's Notice Request]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Set Notice of Financial Course Due Date]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Employee Pay Advice/Income Record and/or Statement Concerning No Employee Income Record]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Auto Assignment of Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income Form (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Social Security Number]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martinez, Lynn [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cob.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?479525
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =