Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00097
    Party Name:Zvelo, Inc. v. Akamai Technologies, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Reset]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reset]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cod.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?185842
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =