open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01999
    Party Name:Kreizel v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cod.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?190465
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =