open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado

COLORADO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:19-16982-
    Party Name:Vito Fernando Melendez and Laura Ann Garcia
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Virtual Order: Confirming Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:November 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Minutes of Proceedings/Minute Order]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Verification of Confirmable Plan]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [1009-1.1 Notice of Amendment to Schedule]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Schedule J]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Schedule I]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [3015 Notice]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses and Charges]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Confirmation Status Report]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Objection to Confirmation/Modification of Plan]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Claimant's Notice of Mortgage Payment Changes]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Personal Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Social Security Number]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Employee Pay Advice/Income Record and/or Statement Concerning No Employee Income Record]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Chapter 13 Calculation of Current Monthly Disposable Income Form (122C-2)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income & Commitment Period Form (122C-1)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cob.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?486569
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =