open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado

COLORADO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:19-16992-
    Party Name:Jonathan Wayne Spears and Tina Marie Makloski
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hepner, Daniel A. [Change of Address]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hepner, Daniel A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hepner, Daniel A. [Discharge-Auto Docket]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hepner, Daniel A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hepner, Daniel A. [Statement of Declination]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hepner, Daniel A. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hepner, Daniel A. [Meeting of Creditors Satisfied]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hepner, Daniel A. [UST Statement and Notice of Presumed Abuse]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hepner, Daniel A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hepner, Daniel A. [Set Hearing (Bankruptcy)]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hepner, Daniel A. [Personal Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hepner, Daniel A. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hepner, Daniel A. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hepner, Daniel A. [1009-1.1 Notice of Amendment to Schedule]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hepner, Daniel A. [Schedule D And/Or Schedule E/F]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hepner, Daniel A. [Claimant's Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hepner, Daniel A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hepner, Daniel A. [Claimant's Notice Request]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hepner, Daniel A. [Auto Assignment of Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hepner, Daniel A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hepner, Daniel A. [Employee Pay Advice/Income Record and/or Statement Concerning No Employee Income Record]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hepner, Daniel A. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income Form (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hepner, Daniel A. [Social Security Number]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hepner, Daniel A. [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hepner, Daniel A. [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hepner, Daniel A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cob.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?486580
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =