U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00226-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Carpenter et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [2255 Motion Filed]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 12, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 06, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 08, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 01, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 25, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • February 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 26, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • January 19, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 13, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 07, 2021: [Strike ]
  • January 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 15, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • April 09, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • April 09, 2020: [Seal]
  • April 09, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • April 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • April 02, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 02, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • April 01, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 27, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 26, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 19, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 13, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Transcript]
  • May 13, 2019: [Transcript]
  • May 07, 2019: [Transcript]
  • May 01, 2019: [Transcript]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 29, 2019: [Transcript]
  • April 24, 2019: [Transcript]
  • April 08, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 03, 2019: [Transcript]
  • April 01, 2019: [Extension of Time]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • March 19, 2019: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 13, 2019: [Transcript]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 06, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 06, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • March 06, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order]
  • March 01, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 01, 2019: [Amended Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • February 22, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
  • February 21, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 21, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • February 20, 2019: [Leave to File]
  • February 20, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 20, 2019: [Seal]
  • February 20, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • February 19, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 19, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • February 19, 2019: [Seal]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • February 08, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 06, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • February 04, 2019: [Strike ]
  • February 01, 2019: [Reply to Response]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 25, 2019: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • January 24, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 24, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • January 23, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • January 18, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 15, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 10, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 10, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 07, 2019: [Transcript]
  • January 03, 2019: [Extension of Time]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reduction of Sentence (non-drug)]
  • December 28, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 21, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 21, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 21, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 21, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 21, 2018: [Dismiss ]
  • December 20, 2018: [Bond]
  • December 14, 2018: [Reduce Sentence (non-drug)]
  • December 11, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 07, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 05, 2018: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • December 05, 2018: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • December 05, 2018: [Witness List]
  • December 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 05, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 05, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 05, 2018: [Continue ]
  • December 05, 2018: [Seal]
  • December 04, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • November 30, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 26, 2018: [Withdraw Document]
  • November 21, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 21, 2018: [Seal]
  • November 20, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • November 20, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 19, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 19, 2018: [Seal]
  • November 16, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 08, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Seal]
  • October 26, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 17, 2018: [Extension of Time]
  • October 05, 2018: [Order]
  • October 04, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 02, 2018: [Seal]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Transcript]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order]
  • June 28, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 26, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 25, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 22, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Status Conference]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 09, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 06, 2018: [Extension of Time]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 19, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
  • March 09, 2018: [Extension of Time]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 18, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • February 18, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • February 07, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 07, 2018: [Extension of Time]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 22, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 17, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 17, 2018: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • January 12, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 12, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • January 11, 2018: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • December 12, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 12, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • December 11, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 11, 2017: [Travel ]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • December 06, 2017: [Exhibit]
  • December 05, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 01, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 01, 2017: [Reply to Response]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 21, 2017: [Travel ]
  • November 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 16, 2017: [Transcript]
  • November 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 14, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • November 13, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • November 10, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • November 09, 2017: [Hearing ]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 06, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [New Trial]
  • October 17, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 02, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 12, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 11, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 11, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 11, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • September 06, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 05, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 05, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • September 01, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 01, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Leave to File]
  • August 21, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • August 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • August 20, 2017: [Leave to File]
  • August 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 11, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 11, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 09, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 04, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • July 28, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 28, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ]
  • July 27, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • July 24, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 20, 2017: [Discovery]
  • July 10, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Travel ]
  • June 12, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 05, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • June 05, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • June 05, 2017: [Seal]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • May 23, 2017: [Seal]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • May 18, 2017: [Travel ]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 14, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 15, 2017: [Exhibit]
  • March 15, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 15, 2017: [New Trial]
  • March 13, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 13, 2017: [Acquittal]
  • March 13, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Extension of Time]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • August 16, 2016: [Extension of Time]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 25, 2016: [Extension of Time]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 17, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • June 07, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 07, 2016: [Court Verdict]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 21, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • March 21, 2016: [Witness List]
  • March 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • March 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 21, 2016: [Bench Trial - Completed]
  • March 17, 2016: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • March 16, 2016: [Transcript]
  • March 16, 2016: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • March 15, 2016: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • March 14, 2016: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • March 14, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 14, 2016: [Acquittal]
  • March 09, 2016: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • March 08, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 08, 2016: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 07, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 07, 2016: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • March 03, 2016: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • March 02, 2016: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • March 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 01, 2016: [Bench Trial - Held]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • February 29, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • February 25, 2016: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • February 24, 2016: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • February 23, 2016: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • February 22, 2016: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • February 22, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 19, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 19, 2016: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • February 19, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 18, 2016: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • February 17, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 17, 2016: [Bench Trial - Begun]
  • February 17, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 16, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 13, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • February 13, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 12, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • February 11, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 10, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 09, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 08, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • February 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 03, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Trial Memo]
  • January 21, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 12, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 08, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • December 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Produce ]
  • December 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • December 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 19, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2015
  • November 06, 2015: [In Limine ]
  • November 02, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • October 14, 2015: [Reconsideration]
  • October 14, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 04, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2015
  • September 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 22, 2015: [Order]
  • September 17, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Strike ]
  • August 27, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • July 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • July 21, 2015: [Seal]
  • July 21, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 21, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 06, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2014
  • June 06, 2014: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • June 05, 2014: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.