U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Voloshin et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
  • April 18, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 14, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 14, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 14, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • April 01, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • April 01, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 01, 2016: [Sentencing]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 31, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 31, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • March 22, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 21, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 16, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 09, 2016: [Continue ]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 26, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 13, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2015
  • December 01, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 01, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 01, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 01, 2015: [Continue ]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 24, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 24, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • November 20, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 20, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 17, 2015: [Hearing ]
  • November 10, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 13, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 08, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2015
  • August 19, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 05, 2015: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • August 04, 2015: [Continue ]
July, 2015
  • July 15, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 10, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • July 01, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 01, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • July 01, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 01, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
June, 2014
  • June 05, 2014: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.