U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00161-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • December 06, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • December 06, 2021: [Seal]
  • December 06, 2021: [Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 14, 2021: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • October 14, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • October 13, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • September 24, 2021: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 21, 2021: [USM Return Executed]
  • September 21, 2021: [USM Return Unexecuted]
  • September 17, 2021: [Hearing ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • September 10, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 03, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 01, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [USM Return Executed]
  • August 11, 2021: [Writ Issued]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • August 10, 2021: [Seal]
  • August 10, 2021: [Application for Writ]
June, 2014
  • June 05, 2014: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.