U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Agritelly
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
  • August 12, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • August 31, 2017: [Amended Judgment]
  • August 31, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 24, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 10, 2017: [Order]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 05, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 04, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 24, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 20, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • April 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 18, 2017: [Continue ]
  • April 17, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 01, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Index to Record on Appeal]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Transcript]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 11, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 11, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 11, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • August 11, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 11, 2015: [Judgment]
  • August 11, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • August 07, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 04, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 23, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 23, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • July 09, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2014
  • June 06, 2014: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.