U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00157-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Braddock et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 22, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Transcript]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial ]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • December 16, 2015: [Return of Passport]
  • December 16, 2015: [Bond]
October, 2015
  • October 08, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 08, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • August 03, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 29, 2015: [Order]
June, 2014
  • June 13, 2014: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 06, 2014: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.