U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sutherland et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • May 04, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • May 04, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Early Termination of Probation]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Continue ]
May, 2016
  • May 12, 2016: [Continue ]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • February 18, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 18, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 18, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • February 12, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 11, 2016: [Continue ]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order]
  • October 16, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2015
  • August 12, 2015: [Order on Motion for Conference]
  • August 10, 2015: [Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
  • August 10, 2015: [Order]
  • August 07, 2015: [Conference]
  • August 06, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2015
  • June 29, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 29, 2015: [Judgment]
  • June 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 23, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • June 23, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 23, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • June 22, 2015: [Dismiss ]
November, 2014
  • November 10, 2014: [Calendar Entry]
June, 2014
  • June 06, 2014: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.