U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Costanzo et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • April 06, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 06, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • April 06, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • March 30, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 27, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • March 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • October 02, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 24, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • September 24, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • September 24, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • June 04, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
  • May 16, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 16, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • May 16, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 13, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 13, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 13, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 13, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 13, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • May 02, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 22, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • April 22, 2016: [Seal]
  • April 18, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 15, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 15, 2016: [Seal]
January, 2016
  • January 04, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 29, 2015: [Seal]
  • December 28, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 10, 2015: [Transcript]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 04, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 04, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 04, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
  • November 02, 2015: [Continue ]
July, 2015
  • July 17, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • July 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 17, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • July 17, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 17, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • July 16, 2015: [Seal]
  • July 14, 2015: [Remark]
  • July 13, 2015: [Exhibit]
  • July 11, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 07, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • July 07, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 06, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2014
  • June 09, 2014: [Continue ]
  • June 06, 2014: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.