U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bigio
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • April 26, 2018: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • April 25, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 25, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 15, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • March 15, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 15, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Payment]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 07, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 21, 2016: [Dismiss ]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • July 30, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
June, 2014
  • June 06, 2014: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.