U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nave et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • April 04, 2022: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • March 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 18, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • March 17, 2022: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 16, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Order]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 08, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 08, 2021: [Seal]
  • April 07, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 07, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 07, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 14, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 13, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • January 13, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 12, 2021: [Violation Report]
  • January 08, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • January 06, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 18, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 18, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • August 23, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • May 21, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • May 15, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • May 11, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • May 11, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 08, 2018: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • May 08, 2018: [Bond]
  • May 04, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • May 03, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • May 03, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 03, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 03, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • May 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • May 03, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 03, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 03, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 03, 2018: [Pretrial Detention]
  • May 03, 2018: [Arrest ]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • March 19, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 19, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • March 12, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 12, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • March 12, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 12, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 12, 2018: [Pretrial Detention]
  • March 12, 2018: [Arrest ]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order]
  • January 22, 2018: [Compliance Review Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • November 20, 2017: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 18, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 18, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 17, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 09, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 09, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 22, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • June 06, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Transcript]
  • May 27, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 20, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 16, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • November 04, 2015: [Status Conference]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
November, 2014
  • November 03, 2014: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
June, 2014
  • June 16, 2014: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 13, 2014: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 06, 2014: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.