U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 12, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 10, 2022: [Violation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • November 08, 2021: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 01, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Reply to Response]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 26, 2021: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • February 24, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 11, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 01, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • February 01, 2021: [Seal]
  • February 01, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 01, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 16, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 14, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 12, 2021: [Seal]
  • January 12, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • January 11, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • January 10, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 16, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 10, 2020: [Seal]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • June 24, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 18, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • June 15, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 15, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 12, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 05, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 04, 2020: [Seal]
  • June 04, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 02, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 01, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2020
  • May 31, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 27, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 27, 2020: [Seal]
  • May 27, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 27, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order on ExParte Motion]
  • May 19, 2020: [ExParte Motion]
  • May 06, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [2255 Motion Filed]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Sealed Order]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Sealed Document]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 27, 2018: [Sealed Order]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • December 12, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 13, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • November 09, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • November 06, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • November 03, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 03, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 03, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • October 31, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 16, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • October 06, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 06, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • October 06, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 06, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 06, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 28, 2017: [Notice]
  • August 25, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • August 25, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • August 18, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • August 18, 2017: [Violation Report]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • July 13, 2017: [Continue ]
  • July 07, 2017: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • June 28, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
March, 2017
  • March 03, 2017: [Order]
  • March 03, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 28, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • February 23, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • February 23, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 23, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 23, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 23, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • February 23, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
  • February 23, 2017: [Arrest ]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Transcript]
  • September 05, 2016: [Transcript]
  • September 02, 2016: [Transcript]
August, 2016
  • August 28, 2016: [Transcript]
  • August 02, 2016: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • May 23, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 23, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • May 23, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 19, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 19, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 19, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 19, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • May 19, 2016: [Payment]
  • May 19, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 09, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 03, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • April 28, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 11, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • April 11, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 08, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 08, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 08, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • April 08, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 08, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • April 05, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 01, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order]
  • March 31, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 21, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 17, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 09, 2016: [Bond]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 24, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 09, 2016: [Continue ]
  • February 01, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 08, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 08, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 08, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 07, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 06, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 27, 2015: [Continue ]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 08, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 03, 2015: [Order]
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 07, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2014
  • October 07, 2014: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2014
  • August 11, 2014: [Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2014
  • June 09, 2014: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.