U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00117-33
  • Case Name: USA v. Maylor et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 27, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order of Transfer]
  • October 24, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 25, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 23, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • February 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 14, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 14, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 14, 2022: [Prob 35 Order Term Probation / SR]
  • February 10, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 10, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 07, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 06, 2022: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 04, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 04, 2022: [Violation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 05, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 11, 2021: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 07, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 18, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order]
  • February 04, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • February 02, 2021: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 31, 2021: [Dismiss ]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • July 10, 2020: [Prob 35 Order Term Probation / SR]
  • July 01, 2020: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • June 23, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Order of Transfer]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 13, 2020: [Notice]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 13, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 10, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 10, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • December 06, 2018: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 04, 2018: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 03, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 03, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 03, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • December 03, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • August 24, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine - 18:3582]
  • August 23, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • August 22, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
  • July 08, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 05, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 03, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 24, 2016: [Transcript]
  • June 21, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • June 16, 2016: [ExParte Document]
  • June 10, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [ExParte Motion]
  • May 09, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • May 09, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • May 09, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 02, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • May 02, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [ExParte Motion]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • March 29, 2016: [ExParte Motion]
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 24, 2016: [Dismiss ]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 23, 2016: [Seal]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [ExParte Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 19, 2015: [ExParte Motion]
November, 2015
  • November 21, 2015: [ExParte Motion]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Order]
  • October 21, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 21, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 21, 2015: [ExParte Motion]
  • October 20, 2015: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
  • October 19, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 08, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • October 08, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 08, 2015: [Add and Terminate Judges]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • September 17, 2015: [Seal]
July, 2015
  • July 14, 2015: [ExParte Motion]
June, 2015
  • June 18, 2015: [Order on ExParte Motion]
March, 2015
  • March 06, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2014
  • December 22, 2014: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
November, 2014
  • November 05, 2014: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
June, 2014
  • June 09, 2014: [Transcript]
  • June 09, 2014: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.