U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:05-cr-00179-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 10, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 10, 2022: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 22, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
July, 2022
  • July 31, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 06, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Reply to Response]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 22, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • March 19, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 10, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 09, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • March 09, 2021: [Seal]
  • March 09, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2014
  • June 09, 2014: [Transcript]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.