U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00265-6
  • Case Name: USA v. Muhammad et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 22, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 17, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [USM Return Executed]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 17, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 15, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 15, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • December 04, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 04, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 21, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 20, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 13, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 08, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 01, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • April 01, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Order]
  • April 18, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • April 16, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 09, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 08, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 02, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 10, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • January 03, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 03, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • January 03, 2018: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 15, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • December 15, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2016
  • June 09, 2016: [Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals]
  • June 07, 2016: [USCA Request]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Transcript]
July, 2015
  • July 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney ]
  • July 07, 2015: [Substitute Attorney ]
  • July 01, 2015: [Index to Record on Appeal]
August, 2014
  • August 22, 2014: [Order of Detention]
June, 2014
  • June 09, 2014: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.