U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00074-18
  • Case Name: USA v. Ogman et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order of Transfer]
  • April 09, 2025: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
  • April 07, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 04, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 03, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Unseal Document]
  • April 01, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 01, 2025: [Transcript]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 02, 2024: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 23, 2023: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 11, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 10, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 09, 2023: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 06, 2023: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 06, 2023: [Summons Issued]
  • January 05, 2023: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 04, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Calendar Entry]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 16, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • December 16, 2022: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 14, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 14, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 14, 2022: [Violation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Instrument Returned]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
July, 2022
  • July 04, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 29, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 29, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • June 15, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • May 27, 2022: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 20, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • May 17, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 17, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • May 06, 2022: [Compliance Review Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2022: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • April 25, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 25, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • April 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 19, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2022: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • April 07, 2022: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 16, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • January 13, 2022: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • January 10, 2022: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 04, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 04, 2022: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 17, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 16, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 15, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 10, 2021: [USM Return Executed]
  • June 03, 2021: [Sealed Document]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • April 07, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 29, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 24, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • March 23, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 18, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 16, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 09, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 12, 2021: [Violation Report]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 29, 2020: [Seal]
  • December 23, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • December 23, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 21, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 09, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 23, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 19, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 16, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 15, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
August, 2020
  • August 30, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • August 30, 2020: [Seal]
  • August 30, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order]
  • August 25, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • August 19, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • August 19, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 30, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 28, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 26, 2020: [Bond]
  • June 26, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 26, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 26, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 26, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • June 26, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 26, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • June 26, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • May 21, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 20, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • March 22, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 21, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 06, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 06, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • March 05, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 01, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 01, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 01, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 01, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 01, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • January 11, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 10, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 09, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • January 08, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • January 07, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 17, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • August 17, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 16, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • August 16, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • August 14, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • August 14, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • August 10, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • August 10, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 17, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • July 10, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 02, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 02, 2018: [Violation Report]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • June 01, 2018: [Hearing ]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • May 24, 2018: [Continue ]
  • May 16, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
  • May 14, 2018: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • May 07, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 16, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 16, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 16, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 06, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • April 03, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 03, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Continue ]
  • March 27, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 26, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 26, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • March 26, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 22, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 22, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 21, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 21, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • March 20, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order]
  • December 04, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • August 26, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 25, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 25, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • August 25, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 03, 2017: [Continue ]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 24, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 24, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 24, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • July 21, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Compliance Review Hearing]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 26, 2017: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 06, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • February 01, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 30, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 30, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 30, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • January 26, 2017: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
  • January 20, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 17, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 17, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 17, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 17, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 10, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • December 20, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 20, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 07, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • December 07, 2016: [Seal]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • November 22, 2016: [Travel ]
  • November 21, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 16, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 16, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 16, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 14, 2016: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 14, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 10, 2016: [Continue ]
  • November 02, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • October 27, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 27, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 26, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • October 26, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • October 24, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order]
  • August 10, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 21, 2016: [Sealed Order]
  • July 21, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 21, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 20, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • July 18, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 11, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • July 11, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: [Judgment]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
  • May 19, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order]
  • May 18, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 18, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 18, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 18, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order]
  • May 10, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2016
  • March 18, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 08, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • March 02, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2015
  • December 14, 2015: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
  • December 03, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • November 17, 2015: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 03, 2015: [Add and Terminate Judges]
August, 2015
  • August 07, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2015
  • July 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 22, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 22, 2015: [Continue ]
  • July 14, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 13, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 13, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2014
  • October 30, 2014: [Continue ]
  • October 20, 2014: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2014
  • July 28, 2014: [Continue ]
  • July 28, 2014: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 25, 2014: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
June, 2014
  • June 26, 2014: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 26, 2014: [Continue ]
  • June 25, 2014: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 19, 2014: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 13, 2014: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 09, 2014: [Order on Sealed Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.