Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:16-30078
    Party Name:David R. Iannone, Jr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:16-30078
    Party Name:David R. Iannone, Jr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:16-30078
    Party Name:David R. Iannone, Jr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [Discharging Debtor - auto docket]
    Date Published:April 26, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:16-30078
    Party Name:David R. Iannone, Jr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [Financial Management Course Certificate - eFinCert]
    Date Published:March 27, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:16-30078
    Party Name:David R. Iannone, Jr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:16-30078
    Party Name:David R. Iannone, Jr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [Hearing Off]
    Date Published:February 02, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:16-30078
    Party Name:David R. Iannone, Jr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:16-30078
    Party Name:David R. Iannone, Jr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [Statistical Summary of Schedules]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:16-30078
    Party Name:David R. Iannone, Jr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:16-30078
    Party Name:David R. Iannone, Jr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:16-30078
    Party Name:David R. Iannone, Jr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [Schedules AB-J]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:16-30078
    Party Name:David R. Iannone, Jr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:16-30078
    Party Name:David R. Iannone, Jr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:16-30078
    Party Name:David R. Iannone, Jr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [Form 122]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:16-30078
    Party Name:David R. Iannone, Jr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 23, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:16-30078
    Party Name:David R. Iannone, Jr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 23, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:16-30078
    Party Name:David R. Iannone, Jr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [Deficiency Notice/Show Cause Hearing]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:16-30078
    Party Name:David R. Iannone, Jr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:16-30078
    Party Name:David R. Iannone, Jr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:January 18, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:16-30078
    Party Name:David R. Iannone, Jr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 18, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.ctb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?276064

Post Your Comment or Question

5 x 2 =