Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Order Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Chapter 13 Worksheet]
    Date Published:June 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Ch 13 Wage Withholding/Employer Information Sheet]
    Date Published:June 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Amended/Modified Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 01, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:April 25, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Closed]
    Date Published:March 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Meeting of Creditors Adjourned (Continued)]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing]
    Date Published:January 28, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:January 27, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Notice of Hearing Set]
    Date Published:January 26, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Hearing Off]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Digital Audio Recording]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Schedules AB-J]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Form 122]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Deficiency Notice/Show Cause Hearing]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Deficiency Notice Plan/Matrix/Fee-Show Cause Hearing]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [none]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-50025
    Party Name:James Pettway and Ann Pettway
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.ctb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?281856

Post Your Comment or Question

7 x 3 =