Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20206
    Party Name:James S. Guzie
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:July 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20206
    Party Name:James S. Guzie
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Withdrawal]
    Date Published:June 27, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20206
    Party Name:James S. Guzie
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:May 26, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20206
    Party Name:James S. Guzie
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Notice of Hearing Set]
    Date Published:May 25, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20206
    Party Name:James S. Guzie
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Discharging Debtor - auto docket]
    Date Published:May 23, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20206
    Party Name:James S. Guzie
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:May 23, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20206
    Party Name:James S. Guzie
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Objection]
    Date Published:May 23, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20206
    Party Name:James S. Guzie
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:May 23, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20206
    Party Name:James S. Guzie
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Deficiency Notice re: Contested Matter Procedure]
    Date Published:May 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20206
    Party Name:James S. Guzie
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Debtor's Certification Re Financial Management Course Completion]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20206
    Party Name:James S. Guzie
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Avoid Lien]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20206
    Party Name:James S. Guzie
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Notice Regarding Debtor Education Course Completion (Ch 7)]
    Date Published:May 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20206
    Party Name:James S. Guzie
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:March 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20206
    Party Name:James S. Guzie
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Closed]
    Date Published:March 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20206
    Party Name:James S. Guzie
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20206
    Party Name:James S. Guzie
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20206
    Party Name:James S. Guzie
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Wage Execution Letter]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20206
    Party Name:James S. Guzie
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20206
    Party Name:James S. Guzie
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [none]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20206
    Party Name:James S. Guzie
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20206
    Party Name:James S. Guzie
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20206
    Party Name:James S. Guzie
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Form 122]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.ctb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?282343

Post Your Comment or Question

4 x 1 =