Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:18-20005
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:18-20005
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Deficiency Notice Re: Ch 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 10, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:18-20005
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Affidavit]
    Date Published:January 09, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:18-20005
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:January 09, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:18-20005
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 09, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:18-20005
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Form 122]
    Date Published:January 09, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:18-20005
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Schedules AB-J]
    Date Published:January 09, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:18-20005
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [none]
    Date Published:January 08, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:18-20005
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 07, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Order]
    Date Published:January 05, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:18-20005
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Deficiency Notice/Notice of Dismissal]
    Date Published:January 05, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:18-20005
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Request for Notices]
    Date Published:January 04, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:18-20005
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
    Date Published:January 04, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:18-20005
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Meeting of Creditors 13 - Hartford]
    Date Published:January 03, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:18-20005
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 03, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:18-20005
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 03, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:October 01, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:September 29, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Digital Audio Recording]
    Date Published:September 28, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:September 28, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing]
    Date Published:September 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Closed]
    Date Published:September 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Hearing Set]
    Date Published:September 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Amended/Modified Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
    Date Published:August 30, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change - No claim on file]
    Date Published:August 28, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Order Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 28, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Digital Audio Recording]
    Date Published:August 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:August 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:August 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:May 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Closed]
    Date Published:April 07, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:March 06, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:March 06, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Request for Notices]
    Date Published:March 01, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing]
    Date Published:February 23, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Form 122]
    Date Published:February 22, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Schedules AB-J]
    Date Published:February 22, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Notice of Hearing Set]
    Date Published:February 21, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:February 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Deficiency Notice/Notice of Dismissal]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [none]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Meeting of Creditors 13 - Hartford]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20207
    Party Name:Julia Navarro
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.ctb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?282344

Post Your Comment or Question

6 x 1 =