open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00064
    Party Name:De Freitas Rodrigues v. Nielsen
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Recommended Ruling]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Recommended Ruling]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Good Standing]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for TRO]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Service Documents]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Filing Order]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Calendar Entry]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Temporary Restraining Order]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?130752
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =