Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00063
    Party Name:Morgan v. Pratt & Whitney
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Calendar Entry]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice 83.1]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Service Documents]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Filing Order]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?130751
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =