open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:19-30058
    Party Name:Karen Bellemare
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [506/522 Pending]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Generate BNC Notice/Form]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Order on Request for Continuance - Initial Hearing]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Request for Continuance - Initial Hearing]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Deficiency Notice re: Motions/Applications]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Amended/Modified Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Avoid Lien]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:May 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Denying Chapter 13 Plan Confirmation]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Digital Audio Recording]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Closed]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Request for Notices]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Hearing Set]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Wage Execution Letter]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Meeting of Creditors 13 - New Haven]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Form 122 - Means Test]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [none]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ctb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?293684
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =