open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:19-30216
    Party Name:David A. Decarlo
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Barbara H. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Barbara H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Barbara H. [Discharging Debtor - auto docket]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Barbara H. [Debtor's Certification Re Financial Management Course Completion]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Barbara H. [Notice Regarding Debtor Education Course Completion (Ch 7)]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Barbara H. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Closed]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Barbara H. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Barbara H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Barbara H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Barbara H. [Request for Notices]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Barbara H. [Amended Statements]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Barbara H. [Deficiency Notice/Notice of Dismissal]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Barbara H. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Barbara H. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Barbara H. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Barbara H. [none]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Barbara H. [Form 122 - Means Test]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Katz, Barbara H. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ctb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?294147
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =