open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00209
    Party Name:McNeil et al v. Yale University et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Conference]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Calendar Entry]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Conference]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Good Standing]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Update Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request to Issue Summons]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Service Documents]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Filing Order]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?131369
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =